There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reuniting Families Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Filipino Veterans Family Reunification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to promote family unity, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
02/06/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 02/06/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/14/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/14/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/14/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 03/06/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/18/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 05/07/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/09/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 05/16/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/17/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/06/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/03/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/11/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/25/2018
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-12] 08/24/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/20/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/12/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/06/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4944.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4944. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2018)

Reuniting Families Act

This bill amends the Immigration and Nationality Act (INA) to

  • recapture unused employment-based and family-sponsored visas from FY1992-FY2016;
  • reclassify spouses, permanent partners, minor children, and stepchildren of permanent residents as immediate relatives;
  • repeal the per-country immigration limits;
  • repeal specified bars to reentry and allow waivers of inadmissibility to promote family unity;
  • exempt children of naturalized Filipino veterans from immigration limitations; and
  • allow relatives of a deceased alien to maintain visa eligibility.

The bill defines "permanent partner" to purposes of applying the INA to LGBT families and individuals.