There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Health Liaison Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Department of Agriculture Reorganization Act of 1994 to establish a Rural Health Liaison.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/06/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/08/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/06/2018Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/06/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 02/06/2018
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 02/08/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 02/16/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 02/20/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 05/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/06/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit03/08/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4945. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/06/2018)

Rural Health Liaison Act of 2018

This bill amends the Department of Agriculture Reorganization Act of 1994 to establish a Rural Health Liaison within the Department of Agriculture to coordinate the role of the department with respect to rural health; provide expertise, guidance, and technical assistance; and perform other specified advocacy, communications, and consulting duties.