There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To increase, effective as of December 1, 2018, the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-258. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018Presented to President.
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2018Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6311)
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4258)
05/18/2018Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-688.
02/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/09/2018Became Public Law No: 115-258. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/2018Signed by President.
09/28/2018HousePresented to President.
09/26/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/25/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2018SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6311)
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-4:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-4:09pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4258)
05/21/2018-4:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4958.
05/21/2018-4:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4258-4259)
05/21/2018-4:04pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/18/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 531.
05/18/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-688.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/20/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
02/07/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
02/07/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/07/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/07/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/12/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 05/07/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/16/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/07/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/18/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-688
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs02/07/2018 Referred to
03/20/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to
09/25/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.4958. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-258 (10/09/2018)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs to increase, as of December 1, 2018, the rates of veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.

Each such increase shall be the same percentage as the increase in benefits provided under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, on the same effective date.