There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain Federal lands in San Bernardino County, California, to the San Bernardino Valley Water Conservation District, and to accept in return certain non-Federal lands, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to convey certain public lands in San Bernardino County, California, to the San Bernardino Valley Water Conservation District, and to accept in return certain exchanged non-public lands, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
08/15/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-320.
07/30/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
06/27/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 329).(text: CR H5202-5203)
06/02/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-155.
01/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/15/2018SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-320.
07/30/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 539.
07/30/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
05/17/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/28/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/27/2017-4:32pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2017-4:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/27/2017-4:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 329). (text: CR H5202-5203)
06/27/2017-4:15pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5217-5218)
06/27/2017-2:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/27/2017-2:00pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 497.
06/27/2017-1:59pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5202-5204)
06/27/2017-1:59pmHouseMr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/02/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 102.
06/02/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-155.
04/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/27/2017HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
04/05/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
02/10/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
01/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31]* 01/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/12/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Markup by
06/02/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-155
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/10/2017 Referred to
04/05/2017 Hearings by
04/27/2017 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/28/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
07/30/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-320

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.497. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/27/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on June 2, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Santa Ana River Wash Plan Land Exchange Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior: (1) to convey to the San Bernardino Valley Water Conservation District in California approximately 327 acres of identified federal land administered by the Bureau of Land Management and any portion of an identified federal parcel necessary to equalize the values of the lands exchanged; and (2) to accept in exchange approximately 310 acres of district land and any portion of an identified nonfederal parcel necessary to equalize the values of the lands exchanged.

To the extent an equalization payment is necessary pursuant to the Federal Land Policy and Management Act of 1976, the amount of such payment shall first be made by way of an in-kind transfer as may be necessary to equalize the fair market values of the properties exchanged. If after such in-kind transfer: (1) the value of the federal lands exceeds the value of the nonfederal lands, the district may make a payment equal to the remaining amount to the United States (if the district opts not to make such payment, the exchange shall not proceed); or (2) the value of the nonfederal lands exceeds the value of the federal lands, Interior shall order the exchange to proceed without requiring any additional payment by the United States to the district.

The values of the lands to be exchanged shall be determined by independent and qualified appraisers according to nationally recognized appraisal standards.

The district shall pay any costs related to such conveyance.

(Sec. 4) The land exchange shall be subject to continuing rights of the district to use, maintain, operate, construct, or relocate or expand groundwater recharge facilities on the nonfederal land exchanged to accommodate groundwater recharge of the Bunker Hill Basin to the extent that those activities are not in conflict with any Habitat Conservation Plan or Habitat Management Plan under which such nonfederal land may be held or managed.

(Sec. 5) The bill terminates Secretarial Order 241, dated November 11, 1929 (relating to the withdrawal of a portion of the federal land for an unconstructed transmission line) and revokes the withdrawal effected by such order.