Text: H.R.4979 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (02/14/2018)

2d Session
H. R. 4979


February 14, 2018

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance


To extend the Generalized System of Preferences and to make technical changes to the competitive need limitations provision of the program.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Extension of Generalized System of Preferences.

(a) In general.—Section 505 of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2465) is amended by striking “December 31, 2017” and inserting “December 31, 2020”.

(b) Effective date.—

(1) IN GENERAL.—The amendment made by subsection (a) shall apply to articles entered on or after the 30th day after the date of the enactment of this Act.


(A) IN GENERAL.—Notwithstanding section 514 of the Tariff Act of 1930 (19 U.S.C. 1514) or any other provision of law and subject to subparagraph (B), any entry of a covered article to which duty-free treatment or other preferential treatment under title V of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2461 et seq.) would have applied if the entry had been made on December 31, 2017, that was made—

(i) after December 31, 2017, and

(ii) before the effective date specified in paragraph (1),

shall be liquidated or reliquidated as though such entry occurred on the effective date specified in paragraph (1).

(B) REQUESTS.—A liquidation or reliquidation may be made under subparagraph (A) with respect to an entry only if a request therefor is filed with U.S. Customs and Border Protection not later than 180 days after the date of the enactment of this Act that contains sufficient information to enable U.S. Customs and Border Protection—

(i) to locate the entry; or

(ii) to reconstruct the entry if it cannot be located.

(C) PAYMENT OF AMOUNTS OWED.—Any amounts owed by the United States pursuant to the liquidation or reliquidation of an entry of a covered article under subparagraph (A) shall be paid, without interest, not later than 90 days after the date of the liquidation or reliquidation (as the case may be).

(3) DEFINITIONS.—In this subsection:

(A) COVERED ARTICLE.—The term “covered article” means an article from a country that is a beneficiary developing country under title V of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2461 et seq.) as of the effective date specified in paragraph (1).

(B) ENTER; ENTRY.—The terms “enter” and “entry” include a withdrawal from warehouse for consumption.

(c) Annual report on enforcement of eligibility criteria.—Not later than 1 year after the date of the enactment of this Act, and annually thereafter through December 31, 2020, the United States Trade Representative shall submit to the Committee on Ways and Means of the House of Representatives and the Committee on Finance of the Senate a report on efforts to ensure that countries designated as beneficiary developing countries under title V of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2461 et seq.) are meeting the eligibility criteria set forth in section 502(c) of such Act (19 U.S.C. 2462(c)).

SEC. 2. Technical modification to procedures for competitive need limitation and waivers.

Section 503 of the Trade Act of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2463) is amended—

(1) in subsection (c)(2)—

(A) in the matter following subparagraph (A)(i)(II), by striking “July 1” and inserting “November 1”; and

(B) in subparagraph (E), by striking “on January 1, 1995” and inserting “in any of the preceding 3 calendar years”; and

(2) in subsection (d), by striking “July 1” each place it appears and inserting “November 1”.

SEC. 3. Customs user fees.

Section 13031(j)(3)(A) of the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 (19 U.S.C. 58c(j)(3)(A)) is amended by striking “February 24, 2027” and inserting “August 1, 2027”.

Passed the House of Representatives February 13, 2018.

    Attest: karen l. haas,