There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Department of State to establish a policy regarding the use of location-tracking consumer devices by employees at diplomatic and consular facilities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/29/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
07/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 335).(text: CR H6319)
02/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/29/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 705.
11/29/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
11/28/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
07/17/2018-6:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2018-6:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 0 (Roll no. 335). (text: CR H6319)
07/17/2018-6:50pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6344)
07/17/2018-5:09pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/17/2018-4:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4989.
07/17/2018-4:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6319-6320)
07/17/2018-4:58pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/17/2018HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
05/17/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/08/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/08/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/08/2018
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 03/22/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/17/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/17/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/08/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations07/18/2018 Referred to
11/28/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4989.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.4989. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (11/29/2018)

Protecting Diplomats from Surveillance Through Consumer Devices Act

This bill directs the Department of State to: (1) establish a policy on the use of location-tracking consumer devices, including GPS-enabled devices, at U.S. diplomatic and consular facilities by U.S. government employees, contractors, locally employed staff, and members of other agencies deployed to or stationed at such facilities; and (2) submit a related report to Congress.

Existing and new employees at such facilities shall, as a part of their security briefings, be informed of such policy and given instructions on the use of location-tracking consumer devices on and off facility premises.

The State Department may coordinate policy formulation with other agencies whose employees are deployed to or stationed at U.S. diplomatic and consular facilities.