There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study to determine the suitability and feasibility of establishing the birthplace of James Weldon Johnson in Jacksonville, Florida, as a unit of the National Park System.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/05/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 5 (Roll no. 231).(text: CR H4752)
04/24/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-644.
02/13/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
06/06/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/05/2018-6:56pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/05/2018-6:56pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 5 (Roll no. 231). (text: CR H4752)
06/05/2018-6:30pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4759-4760)
06/05/2018-5:11pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/05/2018-5:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5005.
06/05/2018-5:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4752-4753)
06/05/2018-5:06pmHouseMr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/24/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493.
04/24/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-644.
04/11/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
04/11/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/11/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
02/28/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
02/16/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/13/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
02/13/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources02/13/2018 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-644
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands02/16/2018 Referred to
02/28/2018 Hearings by
04/11/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/06/2018 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks12/12/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5005.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5005. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/13/2018)

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study to determine the suitability and feasibility of establishing the birthplace of James Weldon Johnson located at Adams and Lee Streets in Jacksonville, Florida, as a unit of the National Park System. James Weldon Johnson was a renowned statesmen, educator, songwriter, author, lawyer, and civil rights activist.