There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

VA Transparency Enhancement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require increased reporting regarding certain surgeries scheduled at medical facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/12/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/26/2017 Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
02/03/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/12/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/12/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/12/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/11/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs01/12/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health02/03/2017 Referred to
09/26/2017 Hearings by

Related Bills (0)

As of 10/23/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.501 - VA Transparency Enhancement Act of 2017.

Subjects (9)

  • Congressional oversight
  • Department of Veterans Affairs
  • Government information and archives
  • Health care quality
  • Health facilities and institutions
  • Health information and medical records
  • Surgery and anesthesia
  • Veterans' medical care

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.501. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/12/2017)

VA Transparency Enhancement Act of 2017

This bill requires the director of each Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) medical facility to report quarterly to the VA on:

  • the number of patients who contracted an infection as result of surgery at such medical facility, including a brief summary of each case; and
  • the number of, and reasons for, scheduled surgeries that were cancelled or transferred to another facility and the subsequent number of days that each patient had to wait for surgery.

The VA shall submit such reports and a summary of such reports to Congress and publish them on its website.