There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Saving America's Pollinators Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to take certain actions related to pesticides that may affect pollinators, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/14/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/08/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/14/2018Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2018Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E186)
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (46)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 02/14/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 02/14/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/14/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/16/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 02/16/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/23/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 02/23/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 02/23/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 02/23/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/23/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 02/26/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/26/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/22/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/11/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 07/03/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/14/2018 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research03/08/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5015. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2018)

Saving America's Pollinators Act of 2018

This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to suspend the registration of members of the nitro group of neonicotinoid insecticides that are registered under the Federal Insecticide, Fungicide, and Rodenticide Act for specified uses. Registration for such uses is suspended until the EPA determines that the insecticides will not cause unreasonable adverse effects on pollinators. The determination must be based on:

  • an evaluation of the published and peer-reviewed scientific evidence, and
  • a completed field study that evaluates residues, chronic low-dose exposure, and cumulative effects of multiple chemical exposures.

For purposes of protecting and ensuring the long-term viability of native bees and other pollinators, the Department of the Interior must monitor and report on the health and population status of native bees.