There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to waive certain requirements for naturalization for American Samoan United States nationals to become United States citizens, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/14/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
03/08/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/28/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
02/14/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2018Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/14/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/26/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 05/17/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/14/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/08/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources02/14/2018 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs02/28/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5026.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5026. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/14/2018)

This bill simplifies the naturalization process for persons born in an outlying possession of the United States (American Samoa and Swains Island). Such persons are U.S. nationals rather than U.S. citizens by virtue of their birth in an outlying possession.

The Immigration and Nationality Act is amended to permit a person to naturalize based upon residency in American Samoa. (Currently, a person from American Samoa must become a state resident in order to naturalize.)

The Department of Homeland Security may, with respect to an applicant: (1) administer the citizenship process (applications, filings, interviews, oaths, and ceremonies) in American Samoa, (2) reduce application fees, and (3) waive the personal interview requirement.

Such applicants are exempted from the naturalization requirement to demonstrate English language and U.S. civics proficiency.

A U.S. citizen parent may apply for naturalization on behalf of a child born in American Samoa.

The bill provides that no court shall have jurisdiction over any naturalization application filed by or on behalf of a resident of American Samoa.