There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Financial Technology Protection Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Financial Technology Protection Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Financial Technology Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish an Independent Financial Technology Task Force, to provide rewards for information leading to convictions related to terrorist use of digital currencies, to establish a FinTech Leadership in Innovation Program to encourage the development of tools and programs to combat terrorist and illicit use of digital currencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9060-9061)
09/26/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-984.
02/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
09/26/2018-6:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-6:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9060-9061)
09/26/2018-5:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5036.
09/26/2018-5:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9060-9062)
09/26/2018-5:57pmHouseMr. Tipton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/26/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 769.
09/26/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-984.
07/24/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 57 - 0.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
07/24/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
02/15/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
02/15/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 02/15/2018
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/08/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/15/2018 Referred to
07/24/2018 Markup by
09/26/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-984
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs09/27/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/26/2018)

Financial Technology Protection Act

This bill provides for the investigation of new financial technologies (e.g., digital currencies) and their use in terrorism and other illicit activities.

(Sec. 3) The bill establishes the Independent Financial Technology Task Force, which must research terrorist and illicit use of new financial technologies and issue an annual report.

(Sec. 4) The bill directs the Department of the Treasury to provide a reward for a person who provides information leading to the conviction of an individual involved with terrorist use of digital currencies.

(Sec. 5) The bill establishes the FinTech Leadership in Innovation Program to support the development of tools and programs to detect terrorist and illicit use of digital currencies.