There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reserve Component Benefits Parity Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 5, 10, and 37 of the United States Code to ensure that an order to serve on active duty under section 12304b of title 10, United States Code, is treated the same as other orders to serve on active duty for determining the eligibility of members of the uniformed services for certain benefits, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
02/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
02/16/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/15/2018Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2018Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/15/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 02/15/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/13/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/13/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/13/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 03/13/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/13/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/13/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 03/13/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 03/13/2018
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/13/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/13/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2018
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/13/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/13/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/13/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/13/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/13/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/13/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/26/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/26/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 03/26/2018
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/02/2018
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/09/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 04/09/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/09/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/09/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 04/13/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 04/13/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/13/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/13/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/18/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/18/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/18/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/27/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/27/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/10/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/05/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/12/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 06/15/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/23/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/26/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 10/09/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/15/2018 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel02/16/2018 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform02/15/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5038. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/2018)

Reserve Component Benefits Parity Act of 2018

This bill makes reserve component members who are deployed to support pre-planned operations of a combatant command eligible for: (1) non-reduction in pay while serving in the uniformed services or National Guard, (2) consideration of active duty service to reduce the age for retired pay; and (3) the high-deployment allowance for lengthy or numerous deployments and frequent mobilizations.