There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Ashanti Alert Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Ashanti Alert Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Ashanti Alert Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ashanti Alert Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage, enhance, and integrate Ashanti Alert plans throughout the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-401. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 2 (Roll no. 450).(consideration: CR H10531-10532; text: CR H10393-10395)
12/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8817-8818)
02/20/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
12/31/2018Became Public Law No: 115-401. (TXT | PDF)
12/31/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/20/2018-2:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/20/2018-2:06pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 386 - 2 (Roll no. 450). (consideration: CR H10531-10532; text: CR H10393-10395)
12/20/2018-12:03pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/20/2018-12:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 5075.
12/20/2018-12:00pmHouseMr. Collins (GA) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10393-10395)
12/10/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/06/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018SenateS.Amdt.4072 Amendment SA 4072 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2018SenateS.Amdt.4072 Amendment SA 4072 proposed by Senator Cornyn for Senator Warner. (consideration: CR S7372) In the nature of a substitute.
12/06/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7372)
12/06/2018SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
09/25/2018-6:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-6:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8817-8818)
09/25/2018-6:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5075.
09/25/2018-6:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8817-8820)
09/25/2018-6:20pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/20/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/20/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/20/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 02/20/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/20/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 03/07/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/20/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/08/2018 Referred to
Senate Judiciary09/26/2018 Referred to
12/06/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5075. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-401 (12/31/2018)

Ashanti Alert Act of 2018

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of Justice (DOJ) to establish a national communications network—the Ashanti Alert communications network—to support regional and local search efforts for missing adults.

The Ashanti Alert communications network must be integrated with the Blue Alert communications network (i.e., the communications network that supports efforts to search for and apprehend violent offenders who injure, kill, or pose an imminent danger to law enforcement).

(Sec. 7) The bill authorizes appropriations for FY2019-FY2022 to carry out the Ashanti Alert communications network.

(Sec. 8) It amends the Justice Assistance Act of 1984 to eliminate existing authority for DOJ to award grants under the Emergency Federal Law Enforcement Assistance Program through FY2022.