There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security to develop an engagement strategy with fusion centers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
11/13/2018Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-355.
03/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1666-1668)
03/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-606.
02/23/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
11/13/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 642.
11/13/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-355.
06/13/2018SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
03/20/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/19/2018-4:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/19/2018-4:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1666-1668)
03/19/2018-4:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5079.
03/19/2018-4:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1667-1669)
03/19/2018-4:41pmHouseMr. Bacon moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 462.
03/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-606.
03/07/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
03/07/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/07/2018HouseSubcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged.
02/28/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/23/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/23/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/23/2018 Referred to
03/07/2018 Markup by
03/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-606
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence02/28/2018 Referred to
03/07/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/20/2018 Referred to
06/13/2018 Markup by
11/13/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-355

No related bill information was received for H.R.5079.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5079. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (11/13/2018)

DHS Field Engagement Accountability Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to develop or update not less frequently than once every five years a strategy for DHS engagement with fusion centers. The term "fusion center" means a collaborative effort of two or more government agencies that combines resources, expertise, or information to maximize the ability of such agencies to detect, prevent, investigate, apprehend, and respond to criminal or terrorist activity. Such strategy shall include: (1) specific goals and objectives for sharing information and engaging with fusion centers, (2) performance metrics for measuring success in achieving such goals and objectives, and (3) a five-year plan for continued engagement with fusion centers.

(Sec. 3) DHS shall: (1) consider the effectiveness of existing processes to identify and prepare field personnel for deployment to support fusion centers and internal mechanisms to ensure oversight and accountability of such personnel; and (2) publish and disseminate performance metrics, taking into account regional and threat diversity.

DHS shall develop and implement a formalized training module for fusion center personnel regarding the classified Homeland Secure Data Network of DHS, or any successor system.

(Sec. 4) DHS shall: (1) develop policies and metrics to ensure effective use by DHS components of the unclassified Homeland Security Information Network, or any successor system; and (2) develop policies for posting unclassified products on the network.

DHS shall assess and implement technical enhancements to the network to improve usability, including search functionality, data analysis, and collaboration capabilities.

(Sec. 5) DHS must report describing the implementation of: (1) the fusion center information sharing strategy, (2) the deployment of field personnel to fusion centers, and (3) policies that seek to ensure the effective use of the Homeland Security Information Network.