There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Enhancing Suspicious Activity Reporting Initiative Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Enhancing Suspicious Activity Reporting Initiative Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Enhancing Suspicious Activity Reporting Initiative Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to improve suspicious activity reporting to prevent acts of terrorism, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5623-5624)
03/19/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-610.
02/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
06/25/2018-7:21pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/25/2018-7:21pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5623-5624)
06/25/2018-7:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5094.
06/25/2018-7:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5623-5625)
06/25/2018-7:13pmHouseMr. King (NY) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 466.
03/19/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-610.
03/07/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/07/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/07/2018HouseSubcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged.
03/05/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/26/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/26/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security02/26/2018 Referred to
03/07/2018 Markup by
03/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-610
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence03/05/2018 Referred to
03/07/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/26/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5094.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5094. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/25/2018)

Enhancing Suspicious Activity Reporting Initiative Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) develop a strategy, by one year after this bill's enactment, to improve its operations and activities related to training, outreach, and information sharing for suspicious activity reporting to prevent acts of terrorism; (2) establish a working group to advise it on suspicious activity reporting; and (3) provide a briefing to the congressional homeland security committees on its operations and activities related to suspicious activity reporting.