There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Enhancing DHS' Fusion Center Technical Assistance Program Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Enhancing DHS' Fusion Center Technical Assistance Program Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish in the Department of Homeland Security a fusion center technical assistance program.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
03/19/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1665)
03/19/2018Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-603.
02/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
03/20/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/19/2018-4:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/19/2018-4:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1665)
03/19/2018-4:23pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5099.
03/19/2018-4:23pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1665-1666)
03/19/2018-4:23pmHouseMr. Estes (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/19/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 459.
03/19/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-603.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/07/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/07/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/07/2018HouseSubcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/05/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
02/27/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
02/27/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/27/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8]* 02/27/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 03/14/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security02/27/2018 Referred to
03/07/2018 Markup by
03/19/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-603
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence03/05/2018 Referred to
03/07/2018 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/20/2018 Referred to

As of 12/13/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5099 - Enhancing DHS' Fusion Center Technical Assistance Program Act.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5099. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (03/19/2018)

Enhancing DHS' Fusion Center Technical Assistance Program Act

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to direct the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a fusion center technical assistance program.

DHS, in carrying out the program, shall: (1) provide technical assistance to fusion centers regarding grants administered under the Urban Areas Security Initiative and the Homeland Security Grant Program, terrorism prevention activities, and intelligence and information sharing; (2) provide to fusion centers notice of any changes to such activities; and (3) make available best practices regarding fusion center operations, information sharing and analysis of homeland security threats, and protecting privacy, civil rights, and civil liberties.