There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Rapid DNA Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Rapid DNA Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Rapid DNA Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Rapid DNA Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Rapid DNA Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a system for integration of Rapid DNA instruments for use by law enforcement to reduce violent crime and reduce the current DNA analysis backlog.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
08/18/2017Became Public Law No: 115-50. (TXT | PDF)
08/18/2017Signed by President.
08/07/2017Presented to President.
08/01/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4695)
08/01/2017Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/16/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4204)
05/11/2017Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-117.
01/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
08/18/2017Became Public Law No: 115-50. (TXT | PDF)
08/18/2017Signed by President.
08/07/2017HousePresented to President.
08/02/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695)
08/01/2017SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/17/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/16/2017-4:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2017-4:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4204)
05/16/2017-4:03pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 510.
05/16/2017-4:03pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4204-4205)
05/16/2017-4:03pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 70.
05/11/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-117.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/08/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/12/2017 Referred to
04/27/2017 Markup by
05/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-117
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations02/08/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary05/17/2017 Referred to
08/01/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.510. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-50 (08/18/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Rapid DNA Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the DNA Identification Act of 1994 to require the Federal Bureau of Investigation (FBI) to issue standards and procedures for using Rapid DNA instruments to analyze DNA samples of criminal offenders.

Rapid DNA instruments carry out a fully automated process to create a DNA analysis from a DNA sample.

DNA samples prepared by criminal justice agencies using Rapid DNA instruments in compliance the FBI-issued standards and procedures may be included in the Combined DNA Index System (CODIS).

(Sec. 3) The bill amends the DNA Analysis Backlog Elimination Act of 2000 to allow the FBI to waive certain existing requirements if a DNA sample is analyzed using Rapid DNA instruments and the results are included in CODIS.