There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

BUILD Act of 2018
Better Utilization of Investments Leading to Development Act of 2018

Short Titles as Reported to House

BUILD Act of 2018
Better Utilization of Investments Leading to Development Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

BUILD Act of 2018
Better Utilization of Investments Leading to Development Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish the United States International Development Finance Corporation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/17/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6320-6330)
07/11/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-814.
02/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/18/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 522.
07/17/2018-5:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/17/2018-5:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6320-6330)
07/17/2018-5:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5105.
07/17/2018-5:09pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6320-6333)
07/17/2018-5:09pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/11/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 631.
07/11/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 115-814.
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/27/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
02/27/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/27/2018
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/01/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/01/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 03/01/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/01/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 03/01/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/01/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 03/01/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 03/05/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/08/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 03/15/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/21/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 04/10/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/10/2018
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 04/11/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/16/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/07/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/07/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/07/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/08/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/08/2018
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 05/09/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/09/2018
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/10/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/15/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/15/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/18/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 05/18/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 05/23/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 06/01/2018
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/01/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/05/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/05/2018
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 06/07/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/12/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/20/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/20/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/21/2018
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 06/22/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/26/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/27/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/28/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/11/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs02/27/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
07/11/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-814

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5105. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/27/2018)

Better Utilization of Investments Leading to Development Act of 2018 or the BUILD Act of 2018

This bill establishes the United States International Development Finance Corporation to facilitate the participation of private sector capital and skills in the economic development of countries with low- or lower-middle-income economies and countries transitioning from nonmarket to market economies in order to complement U.S. assistance and foreign policy objectives.

The corporation may: (1) make loans or loan guarantees, (2) as a minority investor acquire equity or financial interests in entities, (3) provide insurance or reinsurance to private sector entities and qualifying sovereign entities, (4) provide technical assistance, (5) administer special projects, (6) establish enterprise funds, (7) issue obligations, and (8) charge service fees.

The corporation shall terminate after seven years.

The corporation shall not provide assistance to: (1) a country whose government has repeatedly supported acts of international terrorism, or (2) a private sector entity that is engaged in monopolistic practices.

The bill prescribes transitional provisions, including transferring to the corporation the functions, personnel, assets, and liabilities of the Overseas Private Investment Corporation (which is subsequently terminated) and specified elements of the U.S. Agency for International Development.