There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Power And Security Systems (PASS) Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Power And Security Systems (PASS) Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for consideration of the extension under the Energy Policy and Conservation Act of nonapplication of No-Load Mode energy efficiency standards to certain security or life safety alarms or surveillance systems, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H567)
01/12/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/23/2017-3:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/23/2017-3:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H567)
01/23/2017-3:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 511.
01/23/2017-3:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H566-568)
01/23/2017-3:30pmHouseMr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/12/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/12/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 01/12/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce01/12/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.511. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/23/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Power And Security Systems (PASS) Act

This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to require the Department of Energy to issue a rule by July 1, 2021, that determines whether energy conservation standards for external power supplies should be amended. The rule must contain any amended standards and apply to products manufactured on or after July 1, 2023.

Current law exempts external power supplies for security or life safety systems (e.g., smoke alarms) from energy conservation standards until July 1, 2017. This bill extends the exemption until July 1, 2023.