There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

SAFER Voter Act
Second Amendment For Every Registrable Voter Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reduce, from 21 years of age to 18 years of age, the minimum age at which a person may obtain a handgun from a Federal firearms licensee.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/27/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/20/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/27/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/27/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/07/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/14/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 04/10/2018
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 04/23/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/27/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/20/2018 Referred to

As of 10/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5112 - SAFER Voter Act.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.