There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

USA Workforce Tax Credit Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to allow a credit against tax for charitable donations to nonprofit organizations providing workforce training and education scholarships to qualified elementary and secondary students.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/01/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/01/2018Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/01/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 03/01/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/15/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/19/2018
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/17/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/17/2018
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 05/07/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/07/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/07/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/10/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 05/10/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/10/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 05/21/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 05/21/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/29/2018
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 05/29/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/01/2018
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 06/06/2018
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/06/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 06/07/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 06/07/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 06/07/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/12/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/12/2018
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 06/12/2018
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 06/12/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/11/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/11/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/13/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 07/13/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 07/18/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 07/24/2018
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 07/24/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/24/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 07/24/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/12/2018
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 09/12/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 09/12/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/13/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/13/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/24/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 10/05/2018
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/05/2018
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/19/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/01/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5153.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/01/2018)

USA Workforce Tax Credit Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to allow tax credits for charitable contributions to certain nonprofit organizations with the exclusive purpose of providing: (1) workforce development and apprenticeship training, or (2) scholarships for elementary and secondary education expenses of students from households with income that does not exceed 200% of the median gross income.

The bill limits the credits to specified amounts for individuals and corporations. It also: (1) imposes a tax on workforce development, apprenticeship training, and scholarship granting organizations that fail to distribute a specified portion of their receipts; and (2) establishes a $2 billion annual volume cap for the tax credits allowed under this bill.