There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Surgeon General of the Public Health Service to submit to Congress an annual report on the effects of gun violence on public health.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/09/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/05/2018Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/05/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/05/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/05/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/05/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/05/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/19/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 03/19/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/25/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/11/2018
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/01/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/07/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/08/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 06/19/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/19/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/25/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/25/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/03/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/03/2018
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 07/03/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/16/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/16/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 08/14/2018
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 08/14/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 08/14/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/21/2018
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35] 09/06/2018
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/12/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/05/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/09/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5161. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/05/2018)

This bill requires the Surgeon General to report annually to Congress on the effects of gun violence on public health and the status of actions taken to address those effects.