There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

EPS Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

EPS Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

EPS Improvement Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

EPS Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to exclude power supply circuits, drivers, and devices designed to be connected to, and power, light-emitting diodes or organic light-emitting diodes providing illumination from energy conservation standards for external power supplies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
01/12/2018Became Public Law No: 115-115. (TXT | PDF)
01/12/2018Signed by President.
01/02/2018Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/21/2017Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8279)
01/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text of measure as passed: CR H571-572)
01/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/12/2018Became Public Law No: 115-115. (TXT | PDF)
01/12/2018Signed by President.
01/02/2018HousePresented to President.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/21/2017SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279)
01/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/23/2017-4:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/23/2017-4:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text of measure as passed: CR H571-572)
01/23/2017-3:57pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 518.
01/23/2017-3:57pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H571-572)
01/23/2017-3:57pmHouseMr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
01/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/13/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce01/13/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/24/2017 Referred to
12/21/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.518. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-115 (01/12/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on January 23, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

EPS Improvement Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Energy Policy and Conservation Act to exclude from energy conservation standards for external power supplies any power supply circuit, driver, or device designed to power light-emitting diodes (commonly known as LEDs) or to power ceiling fans using direct current motors. The Department of Energy may prescribe new energy conservation standards for that equipment no earlier than one year after the date on which a test procedure has been prescribed.