There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Education Savings Accounts for Military Families Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to allow parents of eligible military dependent children to establish Military Education Savings Accounts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/07/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/07/2018Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2018Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/07/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (77)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/07/2018
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11]* 03/07/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 03/07/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4]* 03/07/2018
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/09/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 03/09/2018
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/09/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/09/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/09/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 03/09/2018
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/09/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/13/2018
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 03/13/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 03/14/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 03/14/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 03/14/2018
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/14/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 03/19/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/19/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/19/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 03/19/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/20/2018
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/20/2018
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 03/21/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/22/2018
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/02/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 04/02/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/02/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/02/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/10/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 04/13/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 04/16/2018
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/16/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/18/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/24/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/26/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/07/2018
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 05/07/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/09/2018
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 05/11/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/15/2018
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/15/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/16/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/17/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/08/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 06/12/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 06/19/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/17/2018
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 09/13/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/13/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/28/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/07/2018 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/07/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/07/2018)

Education Savings Accounts for Military Families Act of 2018

This bill amends the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965 to direct the Department of Education to establish a program to provide children with parents on active duty in the uniformed services with funds for specified educational purposes. Children of active duty service members who reside in a local education agency that receives payments under the Impact Aid Program or who reside within the boundaries of a federal military installation are eligible to receive funds.