There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Strategic and Critical Minerals Production Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Strategic and Critical Minerals Production Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to more efficiently develop domestic sources of the minerals and mineral materials of strategic and critical importance to the economic and national security and manufacturing competitiveness of the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
04/11/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-631.
01/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
04/11/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 482.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-631.
03/07/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/07/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/07/2018Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
02/15/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/13/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 01/23/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/23/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/23/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/23/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/23/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/23/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 01/23/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 01/23/2017
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/23/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/23/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 01/23/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/23/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/24/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/30/2017
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/30/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/30/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/01/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/24/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 02/24/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 03/08/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/16/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/16/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/20/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/21/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/04/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/06/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/26/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/26/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/26/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 04/26/2017
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/26/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 04/26/2017
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/26/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 04/26/2017
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/26/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources01/13/2017 Referred to
03/07/2018 Markup by
04/11/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-631
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/10/2017 Referred to
02/15/2018 Hearings by
03/07/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.520. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (04/11/2018)

National Strategic and Critical Minerals Production Act

This bill addresses the mine permitting process.

Under the bill, projects that provide minerals vital to job creation, energy infrastructure, American economic competitiveness, and national security must be considered to be "infrastructure projects" as described in Executive Order 13604, entitled "Improving Performance of Federal Permitting and Review of Infrastructure Projects" dated March 22, 2012. This order directed federal agencies to significantly reduce the time required to make permitting and review decisions on infrastructure projects.

The bill sets forth general requirements for an existing mineral exploration or mine permit application.

The Bureau of Land Management (BLM) or the Forest Service shall appoint a project lead for the mine permitting process to coordinate with other agencies to ensure that the agencies: minimize delays, set and adhere to timelines for completion of the permitting process, set clear permitting goals, and track progress against goals.

The requirements of the National Environmental Policy Act of 1969 are satisfied if the BLM or the Forest Service determines that the agency issuing the permit will address specified factors, such as environmental impact, alternatives to issuance of the permit, or any irreversible and irretrievable commitment of resources that would be involved in the proposed action. The time period for completion of the mine permitting review process shall not exceed 30 months, except by mutual agreement.

Projects on National Forest System land shall be exempt from regulations that prohibit timber tree cutting and road construction in areas without roads.

The bill does not apply to oil, gas, and potash leasing and development within the designated potash areas of Eddy and Lea Counties, New Mexico.