There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Affairs Purchase Card Misuse Mitigation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Affairs Purchase Card Misuse Mitigation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Affairs Purchase Card Misuse Mitigation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to prohibit employees found to have knowingly misused Department of Veterans Affairs purchase cards from serving as purchase card holders or approving officials.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4256)
05/21/2018Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-692.
03/08/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-3:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-3:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4256)
05/21/2018-3:52pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5215.
05/21/2018-3:52pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4256-4257)
05/21/2018-3:51pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/21/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 535.
05/21/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-692.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/08/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/08/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/08/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/08/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 03/08/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 03/08/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/24/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/08/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/21/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-692
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations03/08/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5215.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5215. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/21/2018)

Veterans Affairs Purchase Card Misuse Mitigation Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to prohibit employees who have knowingly misused VA purchase cards from serving as purchase card holders or approving officials.

Such prohibition shall be in addition to any other applicable penalty.