There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

School Resource Officer Assessment Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

School Resource Officer Assessment Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Attorney General and the Secretary of Education to conduct a survey of all public schools to determine the number of school resource officers at such schools.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
05/15/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3948)
03/09/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
05/16/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
05/15/2018-5:06pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/15/2018-5:06pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3948)
05/15/2018-4:54pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5242.
05/15/2018-4:54pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3947-3949)
05/15/2018-4:54pmHouseMr. Rokita moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/30/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/09/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/09/2018HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/09/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/09/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary03/09/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/30/2018 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/16/2018 Referred to

As of 11/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.5242 - School Resource Officer Assessment Act of 2018.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5242. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/15/2018)

School Resource Officer Assessment Act of 2018

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Justice and the Department of Education to conduct and submit to Congress a survey of the assignment of school resource officers at public elementary and secondary schools.