There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Cuba Agricultural Exports Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modify the prohibition on United States assistance and financing for certain exports to Cuba under the Trade Sanctions Reform and Export Enhancement Act of 2000, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/13/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
01/13/2017 Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017 Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017 Referred to House Foreign Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017 Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (57)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 01/13/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6]* 01/13/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/17/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 01/20/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 01/27/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/31/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/06/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/09/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 02/14/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/15/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 02/27/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/02/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 04/24/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/18/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/24/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/06/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 06/27/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 06/27/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 06/27/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 06/28/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/29/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 07/03/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/17/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 07/24/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 07/26/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/27/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/27/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 08/04/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/11/2017

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/13/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services01/13/2017 Referred to
House Agriculture01/13/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 08/21/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.525 - Cuba Agricultural Exports Act.

Subjects (9)

  • Agricultural trade
  • Caribbean area
  • Cuba
  • Foreign aid and international relief
  • Latin America
  • Sanctions
  • Trade restrictions
  • U.S. and foreign investments

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.525. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2017)

 

Cuba Agricultural Exports Act

This bill amends the Trade Sanctions Reform and Export Enhancement Act of 2000 to exempt from prohibitions against U.S. assistance to Cuba: (1) any exports under the market access program, the export credit guarantee program, and the foreign market development cooperator program; or (2) any obligation or expenditure of funds to promote trade with Cuba by federal commodity promotion programs established in accordance with a commodity promotion law.

This exemption shall not apply if the U.S. assistance recipient would be an entity controlled by the Cuban government, including the armed forces, the Ministry of the Interior, or any subdivision of either governmental entity.

A person subject to U.S. jurisdiction may invest in the development of an agricultural business in Cuba if the Department of State and the Department of Agriculture jointly determine that the agricultural business:

  • is not controlled by the government of Cuba, including the armed forces, the Ministry of the Interior, or any subdivision of either governmental entity; and
  • does not traffic in property of persons subject to U.S. jurisdiction that was confiscated by Cuba on or after January 1, 1959.

Certain language limiting financing of agricultural sales to Cuba is repealed.