There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Retirement Enhancement and Savings Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to encourage retirement savings, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/14/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2018Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (91)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/14/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 03/15/2018
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/15/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/15/2018
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/15/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/20/2018
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/20/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 04/10/2018
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/13/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/13/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/13/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/23/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 04/26/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/26/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 04/26/2018
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/26/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2018
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/17/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 05/17/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/21/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 06/05/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/05/2018
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/05/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 06/05/2018
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2018
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/06/2018
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/06/2018
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/06/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/06/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/13/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/14/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/14/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/12/2018
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 07/12/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/12/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/26/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/26/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 07/26/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/03/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 08/03/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 08/03/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 08/03/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/03/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/10/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/17/2018
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/04/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/04/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/04/2018
Rep. Blum, Rod [R-IA-1] 09/04/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 09/05/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/05/2018
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/12/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 09/12/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/13/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/13/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/24/2018
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/24/2018
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/24/2018
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/24/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/25/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/27/2018
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 10/23/2018
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 10/23/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 10/23/2018
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 11/02/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 12/10/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/10/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/10/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 12/10/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 12/10/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/14/2018 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce03/14/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5282. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/2018)

Retirement Enhancement and Savings Act of 2018

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code and the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 (ERISA) to modify requirements for tax-favored retirement savings accounts, employer-provided retirement plans, and retirement benefits for federal judges.

With respect to employer-provided plans, the bill modifies requirements regarding:

  • multiple employer plans,
  • automatic enrollment and nonelective contributions,
  • loans,
  • terminating or transferring plans,
  • reporting and disclosure rules,
  • nondiscrimination rules,
  • selecting lifetime income providers, and
  • Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation premiums.

The bill also increases the tax credit for small employer pension plan startup costs and allows a tax credit for small employers that establish retirement plans that include automatic enrollment.

With respect to Individual Retirement Accounts (IRAs), the bill:

  • treats taxable non-tuition fellowship and stipend payments as compensation,
  • repeals the maximum age for traditional IRA contributions, and
  • permits any IRA to be a shareholder of any S corporation that is a bank.

The bill makes several modifications to retirement benefits for magistrate judges of the U.S. Tax Court and other federal judges.

The bill also modifies various tax provisions to:

  • reinstate and increase the tax exclusion for benefits provided to volunteer firefighters and emergency medical responders,
  • revise the required distribution rules for pension plans,
  • increase penalties for failing to file tax or retirement plan returns, and
  • require the Internal Revenue Service to share returns and return information with U.S. Customs Border Protection to administer the heavy vehicle use tax.