There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

EMPOWER Care Act
Ensuring Medicaid Provides Opportunities for Widespread Equity, Resources, and Care Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reauthorize the Money Follows the Person Demonstration Program.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
09/13/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/13/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
09/07/2018Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
09/07/2018Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/16/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/15/2018Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/15/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 03/15/2018
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/11/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/11/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/18/2018
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/18/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 04/18/2018
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/27/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 04/27/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/09/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/09/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/09/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/09/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/09/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/09/2018
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/09/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 05/09/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 05/22/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/06/2018
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/07/2018
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/14/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/14/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/26/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/12/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 07/17/2018
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/23/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 07/24/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 07/26/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 08/10/2018
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/06/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/06/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 09/07/2018
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/07/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 09/07/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/07/2018
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/07/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/07/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 09/07/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/07/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/07/2018
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/07/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/07/2018
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/07/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/07/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/07/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/07/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/07/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/07/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/07/2018
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/07/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/07/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 09/07/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/07/2018
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 09/12/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 09/12/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/13/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 09/13/2018
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/20/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/25/2018
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 09/25/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/25/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/26/2018
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/27/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/27/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/28/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/05/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 10/09/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/12/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/16/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 10/26/2018
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/13/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2018
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 11/16/2018
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/20/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 11/20/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/15/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/16/2018 Referred to
09/07/2018 Markup by
09/07/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5306. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/15/2018)

Ensuring Medicaid Provides Opportunities for Widespread Equity, Resources, and Care Act or the EMPOWER Care Act

This bill amends the Deficit Reduction Act of 2005 to reauthorize through FY2022, and otherwise revise, the Money Follows the Person Rebalancing Demonstration Program. (Under this program, the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services must award grants to state Medicaid programs to assist in rebalancing states' long-term care systems.)