There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To repeal section 2141 of the Revised Statutes to remove the prohibition on certain alcohol manufacturing on Indian lands.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-304. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018Presented to President.
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7141)
11/14/2018Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-363.
09/12/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8159)
05/24/2018Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-703.
03/15/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-304. (TXT | PDF)
12/11/2018Signed by President.
11/29/2018HousePresented to President.
11/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/27/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7141)
11/14/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 650.
11/14/2018SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 115-363.
10/03/2018SenateCommittee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
09/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
09/12/2018-7:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/12/2018-7:27pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8159)
09/12/2018-7:22pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5317.
09/12/2018-7:22pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8159-8160)
09/12/2018-7:22pmHouseMr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/24/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 543.
05/24/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-703.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged.
04/26/2018HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs
04/04/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/15/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/15/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/15/2018
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/15/2018
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 03/15/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/15/2018
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/13/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/15/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-703
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs04/04/2018 Referred to
04/26/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs09/17/2018 Referred to
10/03/2018 Markup by
11/14/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-363

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for H.R.5317. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-304 (12/11/2018)

(Sec. 2) This bill repeals a prohibition on creating or continuing a distillery in Indian country for manufacturing ardent spirits (distilled liquors).