Committees: H.R.5317 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/15/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/24/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-703
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs04/04/2018 Referred to
04/26/2018 Hearings by
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Indian Affairs09/17/2018 Referred to
10/03/2018 Markup by
11/14/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-363