There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

DREAMer Information Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the protection of information submitted to the Department of Homeland Security pursuant to the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
02/08/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/13/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 01/31/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/01/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/01/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/01/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/01/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 02/01/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 02/01/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 02/01/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/02/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/02/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 03/02/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 03/17/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/13/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security02/08/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.532.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.532. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2017)

DREAMer Information Protection Act

This bill: (1) prohibits information provided by an applicant for deferred action under the Department of Homeland Security's Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program from being used for the purpose of immigration enforcement proceedings, and (2) shall take effect as if enacted on January 19, 2017.