There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Over-the-Counter Monograph Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Over-the-Counter Monograph User Fee Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Over-the-Counter Monograph Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Over-the-Counter Monograph User Fee Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to clarify the regulatory framework with respect to certain nonprescription drugs that are marketed without an approved new drug application, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/16/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6227-6235)
07/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-827.
03/19/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/17/2018SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 518.
07/16/2018-6:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/16/2018-6:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6227-6235)
07/16/2018-6:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5333.
07/16/2018-6:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6227-6237)
07/16/2018-6:06pmHouseMr. Latta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/16/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 640.
07/16/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-827.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/09/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/23/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/19/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/19/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/19/2018 Referred to
05/09/2018 Markup by
07/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-827
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/23/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.