There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Lyon County Economic Development and Environmental Remediation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Lyon County Economic Development and Environmental Remediation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To facilitate resolution of environmental remediation and reclamation, resolve potential liability of the United States, and promote economic development in Lyon County, Nevada, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/02/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1002.
03/20/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date All Actions
11/02/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 783.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/02/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1002.
07/18/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 16 - 15.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/18/2018Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
07/17/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
04/04/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/20/2018Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/20/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/20/2018 Referred to
07/18/2018 Markup by
11/02/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1002
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/04/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Hearings by
07/18/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5347.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5347. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/20/2018)

Lyon County Economic Development and Environmental Remediation Act

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey to Atlantic Richfield Company all right, title, and interest (including miner rights) of the United States in and to approximately 2,062 acres of five parcels of land managed by the Bureau of Land Management and located in Lyon County, Nevada. This conveyance is for the purpose of remediation and reclamation of abandoned copper mines on the land and economic development in the county.