There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Taiwan Travel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage visits between the United States and Taiwan at all levels, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/13/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/12/2017 Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/15/2017 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific
06/15/2017 Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific
02/16/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/13/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/13/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/20/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/27/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/11/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/22/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/08/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/13/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/16/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/16/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/20/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/21/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/22/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/22/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/22/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 06/27/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/28/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/13/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 07/27/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/27/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 08/01/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 08/01/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 08/04/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/04/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 08/08/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/12/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/21/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/21/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/25/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/26/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/27/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/02/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/03/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/04/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 10/04/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 10/10/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/11/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 10/11/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/11/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/12/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/19/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/19/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/19/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs01/13/2017 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific02/16/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
06/15/2017 Reported by

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Asia
  • Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
  • Federal officials
  • Taiwan
  • Travel and tourism

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.535. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/13/2017)

Taiwan Travel Act

This bill expresses the sense of Congress that the U.S. government should encourage visits between U.S and Taiwanese officials at all levels.

The bill states that it should be U.S. policy to: (1) allow officials at all levels of the U.S. government to travel to Taiwan to meet their Taiwanese counterparts; (2) permit high-level Taiwanese officials to enter the United States under respectful conditions and to meet with U.S. officials, including officials from the Department of State and the Department of Defense; and (3) encourage the Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office, and any other instrumentality established by Taiwan, to conduct business in the United States.