There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Taiwan Travel Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Taiwan Travel Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Taiwan Travel Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Taiwan Travel Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Taiwan Travel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To encourage visits between the United States and Taiwan at all levels, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/16/2018Became Public Law No: 115-135. (TXT | PDF)
03/16/2018Signed by President.
03/05/2018Presented to President.
02/28/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1290-1291)
02/12/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
01/09/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H57)
01/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/16/2018Became Public Law No: 115-135. (TXT | PDF)
03/16/2018Signed by President.
03/05/2018HousePresented to President.
03/01/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/28/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1290-1291)
02/12/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 310.
02/12/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/10/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
01/09/2018-3:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/09/2018-3:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H57)
01/09/2018-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 535.
01/09/2018-3:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H57-59)
01/09/2018-3:12pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/15/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific
06/15/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific
02/16/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
01/13/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
01/13/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 01/13/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/20/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 04/27/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/11/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/22/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/08/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/13/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/16/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/16/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 06/20/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/20/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/21/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/22/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/22/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/22/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 06/27/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 06/28/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/13/2017
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 07/27/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/27/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 08/01/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 08/01/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 08/04/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/04/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 08/08/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/06/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/08/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 09/12/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/12/2017
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/21/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/21/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 09/25/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 09/26/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/27/2017
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/02/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 10/03/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/04/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 10/04/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 10/10/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 10/10/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 10/11/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 10/11/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/11/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 10/12/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/12/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 10/12/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/19/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/19/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/19/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/23/2017
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/25/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/01/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/01/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/01/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/01/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/02/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/07/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/13/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 11/30/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 12/06/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/12/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 01/08/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 01/08/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/08/2018
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 01/08/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 01/08/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 01/08/2018
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 01/08/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 01/09/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs01/13/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific02/16/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
06/15/2017 Reported by
Senate Foreign Relations01/10/2018 Referred to
02/07/2018 Markup by
02/12/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.535. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-135 (03/16/2018)

Taiwan Travel Act

(Sec. 3) This bill expresses the sense of Congress that the U.S. government should encourage visits between U.S. and Taiwanese officials at all levels.

The bill states that it should be U.S. policy to: (1) allow U.S. officials at all levels to travel to Taiwan to meet their Taiwanese counterparts; (2) permit high-level Taiwanese officials to enter the United States under respectful conditions and to meet with U.S. officials, including officials from the Departments of State and Defense; and (3) encourage the Taipei Economic and Cultural Representative Office and any other instrumentality established by Taiwan to conduct business in the United States.