There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Algae Agriculture Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide support for the production of algae, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/21/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
03/23/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/21/2018Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2018Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18]* 03/21/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/21/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 03/21/2018
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/26/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/01/2018
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 06/28/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture03/21/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/21/2018 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy03/23/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5373. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/21/2018)

Algae Agriculture Act of 2018

This bill modifies several Department of Agriculture research, commodity, and energy programs to authorize assistance for activities related to algae production.