There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Ammunition Background Check Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prevent the purchase of ammunition by prohibited purchasers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/30/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/22/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/22/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/22/2018
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/10/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/10/2018
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/10/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/10/2018
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/12/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/12/2018
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/12/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/12/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/16/2018
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/16/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/17/2018
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/24/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 04/24/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2018
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 04/26/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 04/27/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/07/2018
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/25/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/05/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/03/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 08/03/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 08/07/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/10/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 08/10/2018
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 08/21/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 09/05/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/17/2018
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 11/09/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/22/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/30/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5383. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2018)

Ammunition Background Check Act of 2018

This bill establishes new requirements and restrictions with respect to the sale and transfer of ammunition.