There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Dr. Benjy Frances Brooks Children's Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Children's Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2018

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Dr. Benjy Frances Brooks Children's Hospital GME Support Reauthorization Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize the program of payments to children's hospitals that operate graduate medical education programs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
09/18/2018Became Public Law No: 115-241.
09/18/2018Signed by President.
09/06/2018Presented to President.
09/04/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
03/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
09/18/2018Became Public Law No: 115-241.
09/18/2018Signed by President.
09/06/2018HousePresented to President.
09/05/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/04/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6032)
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/23/2018-3:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-3:01pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6600)
07/23/2018-2:51pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5385.
07/23/2018-2:51pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6600-6602)
07/23/2018-2:50pmHouseMr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/12/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
07/12/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
06/27/2018HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
06/27/2018HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
03/23/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/22/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
03/22/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/22/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/10/2018
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/10/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 04/18/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 04/18/2018
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 04/18/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/18/2018
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/24/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/24/2018
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/24/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/24/2018
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/26/2018
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/07/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 05/07/2018
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/10/2018
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/15/2018
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/15/2018
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/15/2018
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/15/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/15/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 05/15/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/17/2018
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/17/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/18/2018
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/18/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 05/18/2018
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/21/2018
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/21/2018
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2018
Rep. Carter, Earl L. "Buddy" [R-GA-1] 05/22/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 05/22/2018
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/22/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/22/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/22/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/22/2018
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 05/23/2018
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/23/2018
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/23/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 05/24/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/24/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 06/05/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/05/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2018
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2018
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/05/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/06/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 06/06/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/06/2018
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/08/2018
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 06/08/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/08/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 06/08/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 06/12/2018
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 06/20/2018
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 06/20/2018
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/21/2018
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/27/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/27/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/27/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/28/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/28/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/28/2018
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 06/28/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 06/28/2018
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2018
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/10/2018
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 07/10/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 07/13/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/13/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/13/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/16/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/16/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/22/2018 Referred to
07/12/2018 Markup by
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/23/2018 Referred to
06/27/2018 Markup by
06/27/2018 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.