There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 116 Main Street in Dansville, New York, as the "Staff Sergeant Alexandria Gleason-Morrow Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-355. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018Presented to President.
12/12/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7528)
11/29/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H9726-9727)
11/29/2018Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
03/22/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-355. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2018Signed by President.
12/21/2018HousePresented to President.
12/13/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7528)
12/03/2018SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
11/29/2018-6:07pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/29/2018-6:07pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H9726-9727)
11/29/2018-6:07pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H9726-9727)
11/29/2018HouseCommittee on Oversight and Government discharged.
11/29/2018-6:07pmHouseMr. Comer asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
07/17/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
07/17/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/22/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/22/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/22/2018 Referred to
07/17/2018 Markup by
11/29/2018 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.5395.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5395. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-355 (12/21/2018)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 116 Main Street in Dansville, New York, as the "Staff Sergeant Alexandria Gleason-Morrow Post Office Building."