There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Honest Elections and Campaign, No Gain Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to require each authorized committee or leadership PAC of a candidate for election for Federal office to disburse all of the funds of the committee or PAC which remain unexpended after the date of the election, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/23/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/30/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/23/2018Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2018Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 03/29/2018
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/14/2018
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/27/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/28/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration03/23/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary03/23/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/30/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5409.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/2018)

Honest Elections and Campaign, No Gain Act

This bill requires each authorized candidate committee or leadership political action committee (PAC) to disburse all unused funds within a specified time period beginning after an election, unless the candidate files to run for office again before the disbursement period begins. A committee or PAC disbursing unspent funds shall first pay any obligations incurred and, if funds are left over, it may disburse the funds in specified ways, such as by transferring the funds to a national or state committee of a political party.