There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Veterans Access to Congressional Services Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to permit Members of Congress to use facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs for the purposes of meeting with constituents, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/26/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/13/2018Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/26/2018Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/26/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/26/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3]* 03/26/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/05/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 04/24/2018
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 04/25/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 04/25/2018
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 04/25/2018
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 04/25/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 05/16/2018
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/16/2018
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 05/16/2018
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/16/2018
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/16/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 05/16/2018
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/16/2018
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/16/2018
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/16/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 05/16/2018
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/16/2018
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/16/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 05/16/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/16/2018
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/16/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/16/2018
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/16/2018
Rep. Panetta, Jimmy [D-CA-20] 05/16/2018
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 05/16/2018
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/16/2018
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 05/16/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/16/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 05/16/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/29/2018
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/11/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 09/05/2018
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/26/2018 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/26/2018 Referred to
09/13/2018 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.5413.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.