There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans Affairs Medical-Surgical Purchasing Stabilization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Veterans Affairs Medical-Surgical Purchasing Stabilization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Affairs Medical-Surgical Purchasing Stabilization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to carry out the Medical Surgical Prime Vendor program using multiple prime vendors.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4257)
05/21/2018Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-693.
03/29/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
08/01/2018SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-616.
05/22/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/21/2018-4:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/21/2018-4:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4257)
05/21/2018-3:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5418.
05/21/2018-3:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4257-4258)
05/21/2018-3:58pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/21/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 536.
05/21/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-693.
05/08/2018HouseSubcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged.
05/08/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
05/08/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/29/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/29/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/29/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/29/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3]* 03/29/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2]* 03/29/2018
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/29/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Markup by
05/21/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-693
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations03/29/2018 Referred to
05/08/2018 Discharged from
Senate Veterans' Affairs05/22/2018 Referred to
08/01/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5418. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/21/2018)

Veterans Affairs Medical-Surgical Purchasing Stabilization Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), in procuring medical, surgical, dental, or laboratory items for VA medical facilities through the Medical Surgical Prime Vendor (MSPV) program, to: (1) award contracts to multiple regional prime vendors instead of a single nationwide prime vendor, and (2) prohibit a prime vendor from solely designing the formulary of items available for MSPV purchase.

The VA shall: (1) ensure that each VA employee who conducts formulary analyses or makes decisions about including items on the formulary has relevant medical expertise, and (2) provide Congress with periodic lists of such individuals and their medical expertise listed by categories of formulary items.