There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FDR Historic Preservation Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

FDR Historic Preservation Act

Short Titles as Introduced

FDR Historic Preservation Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the acquisition of land for addition to the Home of Franklin D. Roosevelt National Historic Site in the State of New York, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/26/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 394 - 15 (Roll no. 404).
09/25/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-970.
03/29/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
12/12/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
09/27/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/26/2018-1:57pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/26/2018-1:57pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 394 - 15 (Roll no. 404).
09/26/2018-1:50pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8904-8905)
09/25/2018-9:10pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. McClintock objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
09/25/2018-9:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5420.
09/25/2018-9:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8858-8859; text: CR H8858)
09/25/2018-9:07pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 758.
09/25/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-970.
09/05/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
09/05/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/05/2018HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
04/05/2018HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/29/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/29/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/29/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Markup by
09/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-970
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/05/2018 Referred to
09/05/2018 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/27/2018 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks12/12/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5420. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/2018)

FDR Historic Preservation Act

This bill authorizes the Department of the Interior to acquire, by donation, purchase from a willing seller, or exchange, approximately 89 acres of land to be added to the Home of Franklin D. Roosevelt National Historic Site.