There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

School and Student Safety Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to give a public safety and community policing grant preference for applicants prioritizing the hiring of school resource officers, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/05/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/30/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/05/2018Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/05/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. MacArthur, Thomas [R-NJ-3] 05/22/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/06/2018
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large] 07/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/05/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations04/30/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5427.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5427. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/05/2018)

School and Student Safety Act of 2018

This bill amends the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to permanently reauthorize the Community Oriented Policing Services (COPS) program and modify it:

  • to allow the Department of Justice to give preference to a COPS program grant applicant that prioritizes hiring veterans or retired law enforcement officers as school resource officers, and
  • to allocate 25% of COPS program funds for grants to establish school-based partnerships between local law enforcement agencies and school systems.