There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stand with UK against Russia Violations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To impose sanctions on certain persons responsible for the March 12, 2018, attack on Sergei and Yulia Skripal, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/05/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
04/05/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/05/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/05/2018Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/05/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/05/2018
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 04/11/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/06/2018

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs04/05/2018 Referred to
House Judiciary04/05/2018 Referred to
House Financial Services04/05/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5428. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/05/2018)

Stand with UK against Russia Violations Act

This bill directs the President to impose property-blocking or U.S. exclusion sanctions on any person who (1) knowingly assisted in the attack against Sergei Skripal and Yulia Skripal in England on March 4, 2018; or (2) is an officer, employee, or agent of the government of Russia and knowingly assisted in the murder, attempted murder, or assault committed outside of Russia against any expatriate, dissident, or foreign national.

After the imposition of any such sanction, the President shall (1) issue regulations prohibiting U.S. persons and entities from dealing in certain Russian sovereign debt (bonds, foreign exchange swap agreements, and other financial instruments); and (2) block and prohibit all transactions in U.S.-sited or- controlled property and property interests of specified Russian financial institutions.