There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

21st Century IRS Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

21st Century IRS Act

Short Titles as Introduced

21st Century IRS Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to improve cybersecurity and taxpayer identity protection, and modernize the information technology of the Internal Revenue Service, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/18/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 414 - 3 (Roll no. 145).(text: CR H3422-3424)
04/13/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-638.
04/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date All Actions
04/18/2018-6:24pmPursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 831, H.R. 5445 is laid on the table.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-5:55pmMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-5:55pmOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 414 - 3 (Roll no. 145). (text: CR H3422-3424)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-5:32pmConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3428-3429)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-2:59pmPOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 5445, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill, and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Jenkins (KS) demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage of H.R. 5445 until later in the legislative day.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-2:58pmThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-2:28pmDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 5445.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-2:27pmRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445. Rule provides for consideration of both H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Ways and Means for each measure. Rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-2:27pmConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 831. (consideration: CR H3422-3428)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/18/2018-1:33pmRule H. Res. 831 passed House.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/2018-6:43pmRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 831 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445. Rule provides for consideration of both H.R. 5444 and H.R. 5445 under closed rules with one hour of debate equally divided and controlled by the Chair and Ranking Member of the Committee on Ways and Means for each measure. Rule also provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for each measure.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/13/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 489.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/13/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-638.
04/11/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/11/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/10/2018Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/10/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/12/2018
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 04/12/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/12/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/12/2018
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Ways and Means04/10/2018 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/13/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-638

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5445. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House with amendment(s) (04/13/2018)

21st Century IRS Act

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to establish requirements for the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) regarding cybersecurity, the protection of taxpayer identities, information technology, and electronic systems.

With respect to cybersecurity and identity protection, the bill:

  • requires the IRS to work with the public and private sectors to protect taxpayers from identity theft refund fraud,
  • requires the Electronic Tax Administration Advisory Committee to make recommendations to prevent identity theft and refund fraud,
  • authorizes the IRS to participate in an information sharing and analysis center for identity theft tax refund fraud, and
  • prohibits the disclosure of returns or return information to contractors or other agents for agencies that do not comply with confidentiality safeguards.

The IRS must develop and implement:

  • online accounts to provide services to taxpayers and return preparers,
  • a process for accepting electronic tax forms and supporting documents,
  • an Internet platform for Form 1099 filings,
  • a fully automated program for disclosing taxpayer information for third-party income verification using the Internet, and
  • uniform standards and procedures for the acceptance of electronic signatures.

The bill also:

  • establishes the position of IRS Chief Information Officer;
  • limits redisclosures and uses of tax return information by individuals designated by taxpayers to receive the information;
  • allows the IRS to require additional taxpayers to file returns electronically; and
  • allows the IRS to pay fees for the use of credit, debit, or charge cards for tax payments if the fees are recouped by charging taxpayers.