There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (19)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • CLASSICS Act
  • Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Reported to House for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • CLASSICS Act
  • Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • CLASSICS Act
  • Compensating Legacy Artists for their Songs, Service, and Important Contributions to Society Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To modernize copyright law, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/25/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 154).(text: CR H3522-3536)
04/25/2018Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-651.
04/10/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/26/2018SenateReceived in the Senate.
04/25/2018-4:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/25/2018-4:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 154). (text: CR H3522-3536)
04/25/2018-4:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3560-3561)
04/25/2018-2:57pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/25/2018-2:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5447.
04/25/2018-2:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3522-3542)
04/25/2018-2:05pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/25/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 499.
04/25/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-651.
04/11/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/11/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/10/2018HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/10/2018HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 04/10/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 04/10/2018
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 04/23/2018
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/23/2018
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 04/23/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 04/23/2018
Rep. Handel, Karen C. [R-GA-6] 04/23/2018
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 04/23/2018
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/23/2018
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/23/2018
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 04/24/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/24/2018
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/24/2018
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 04/24/2018
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/24/2018
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/24/2018
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/24/2018
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 04/24/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 04/25/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/25/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 04/25/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/10/2018 Referred to
04/11/2018 Markup by
04/25/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-651

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5447. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/10/2018)

Music Modernization Act

This bill makes various changes to copyright law related to sound recordings, including providing protection for sound recordings fixed before February 15, 1972, creating a system for paying royalties to producers and sound engineers, and establishing a statutory blanket license for digital music services. The blanket license allows music services to distribute sound recordings covered by the license without negotiating for the rights for each individual recording, as long as the music service complies with the license's requirements, such as paying the required royalties.