There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Rural DOCS Act
Rural Development of Opioid Capacity Services Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural DOCS Act
Rural Development of Opioid Capacity Services Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to provide for a demonstration project to increase substance use provider capacity under the Medicaid program.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
06/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-731.
04/11/2018Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
06/12/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 566.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/12/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-731.
05/17/2018Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/17/2018Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/25/2018Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health
04/25/2018Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/11/2018Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/11/2018Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/17/2018
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/07/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 06/08/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/11/2018 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
06/12/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-731
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/25/2018 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5477. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/11/2018)

Rural Development of Opioid Capacity Services Act or the Rural DOCS Act

This bill requires the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services (CMS) to carry out a demonstration project to provide an enhanced federal matching rate for state Medicaid expenditures related to the expansion of substance-use treatment and recovery services.

The CMS must select 10 states for inclusion under the demonstration project, giving preference to states that have a prevalence of substance-use disorders (in particular, opioid-use disorders) comparable to or higher than the national average.